U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:92-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kyles et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 03, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • October 23, 2015: [USCA Request]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Appeal Record Returned]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2014
  • October 23, 2014: [Reply/Response Misc]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.