U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 21, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 15, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 02, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2014
  • October 25, 2014: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.