U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Raymond et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 02, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 02, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 02, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • March 02, 2016: [Witness List]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 28, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 24, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 12, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 01, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 26, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 10, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 30, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 21, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 21, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 21, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 14, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 14, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 14, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 14, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 14, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 12, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 05, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 01, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 01, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2015: [Status Conference]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2014
  • October 27, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.