U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00289-11
  • Case Name: USA v. Gjuraj et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Returning Submission]
  • June 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [Seal]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 31, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 31, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 31, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • February 17, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 12, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 11, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 10, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • February 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • January 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 18, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 13, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 03, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 03, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • July 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 02, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 26, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 19, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 18, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 18, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 29, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 29, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 07, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 31, 2020: [Seal]
  • March 31, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 27, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 12, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Continue ]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • December 17, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 04, 2019: [Search Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 20, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 31, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • October 27, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 27, 2019: [Seal]
  • October 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 11, 2019: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 26, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 01, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 09, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 08, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2017: [Seal]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 31, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 09, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 09, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 31, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
  • March 21, 2016: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 08, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 14, 2015: [Violation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • October 02, 2015: [Sealed Document]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 12, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 24, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • July 24, 2015: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • July 16, 2015: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Transcript]
April, 2015
  • April 16, 2015: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2015
  • February 25, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2014
  • November 17, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 12, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2014
  • October 29, 2014: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 28, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.