U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ardila
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • May 27, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 14, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 14, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal - USSC Amendment]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - USSC Amendment]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 19, 2016: [Travel ]
October, 2014
  • October 28, 2014: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.