U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santiago et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 22, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 22, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 01, 2019: [Continue ]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 17, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 18, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 01, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • March 01, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 13, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 31, 2018: [Violation Report]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • August 22, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 20, 2018: [Appearance Pro Se]
  • August 20, 2018: [Conference]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Status Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Bond]
  • October 04, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 31, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • May 31, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 25, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 25, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 25, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 25, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
March, 2015
  • March 30, 2015: [Sealed Document]
February, 2015
  • February 11, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2014
  • November 04, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.