U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 14, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 03, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 01, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Transcript]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 03, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 23, 2020: [Violation Report]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
November, 2014
  • November 04, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.