U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 13, 2020: [Continue ]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 12, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 17, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 17, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 14, 2019: [Restitution Order]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • October 02, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 01, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 01, 2018: [Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 25, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 22, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 19, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 13, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 06, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 06, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • August 06, 2018: [Travel ]
  • August 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 18, 2018: [Consent Form]
  • June 18, 2018: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • June 18, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 18, 2018: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • June 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 18, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 18, 2018: [Information - Felony]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 22, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 22, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • March 19, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 09, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 04, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 02, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [USM Return Unexecuted]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 25, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 20, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 10, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 10, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 06, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 16, 2015: [Notice]
November, 2014
  • November 06, 2014: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.