U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. He
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Sealed Transcript]
  • October 27, 2021: [Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 01, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 01, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • March 01, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • February 21, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 21, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 23, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 27, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 27, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 27, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 07, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2014
  • November 06, 2014: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.