U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00215-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perrotti
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 01, 2019: [Dismiss ]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 04, 2018: [Vacate ]
  • September 04, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continue ]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Continue ]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Travel ]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Travel ]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Travel ]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 12, 2017: [Travel ]
  • June 02, 2017: [Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Travel ]
  • November 10, 2016: [Travel ]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • October 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 20, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • September 26, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • September 20, 2016: [Travel ]
  • September 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Travel ]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 07, 2016: [Travel ]
  • July 05, 2016: [Travel ]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Travel ]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • April 18, 2016: [Travel ]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Court Exhibits]
  • January 29, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 23, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • November 12, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 26, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 14, 2015: [Transcript]
  • October 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 25, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2015: [New Trial]
  • August 20, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 11, 2015: [Extension of Time]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 29, 2015: [Witness List]
  • July 29, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 28, 2015: [Jury Verdict]
  • July 28, 2015: [Jury Instructions/Charge]
  • July 28, 2015: [Court Exhibits]
  • July 23, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • July 23, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2015: [Transcript]
  • July 20, 2015: [New Trial]
  • July 16, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • July 16, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • July 16, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • July 16, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • July 15, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 15, 2015: [Acquittal]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • July 15, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 15, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 15, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2015: [Preclude]
  • July 13, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • July 13, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • July 12, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • July 11, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • July 11, 2015: [Order]
  • July 09, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • July 09, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 09, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 08, 2015: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • July 08, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2015: [Jury Selection]
  • July 07, 2015: [Suppress]
  • July 07, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • July 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 06, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 03, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • July 01, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • June 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 18, 2015: [Witness List]
  • June 18, 2015: [Exhibit List]
November, 2014
  • November 07, 2014: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.