U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brennan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Application for Writ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • January 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • January 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • December 10, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 03, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 02, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 02, 2016: [Letter]
November, 2014
  • November 07, 2014: [USCA Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.