U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 05, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 17, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • January 17, 2019: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 27, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 09, 2016: [Court Exhibits]
  • August 05, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 05, 2016: [Dismiss ]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 24, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 27, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 16, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 02, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 02, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2014
  • November 12, 2014: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.