U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00228-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Lehal et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 18, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 16, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Transcript]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Letter]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order]
  • May 13, 2016: [Letter]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice]
  • April 13, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2014
  • November 12, 2014: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.