U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCoy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 18, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 03, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 12, 2019: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • April 08, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 03, 2019: [Status Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 29, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 27, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • March 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2014
  • November 13, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.