U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00113-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • November 04, 2020: [Exoneration of Bond]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 23, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 23, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 22, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 22, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 09, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 23, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Continue ]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continue ]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 28, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 25, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 25, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 21, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 11, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Payment]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 07, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
April, 2015
  • April 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
December, 2014
  • December 17, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2014
  • November 13, 2014: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.