U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00044-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Mansa et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 31, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 23, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • November 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 19, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 15, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 14, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • November 14, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 13, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Passport Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Seal]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Seal]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Document Unsealed]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • July 10, 2017: [Unseal Document]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Vacate ]
March, 2015
  • March 06, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2014
  • November 13, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.