U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00213-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Sealed Document]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • September 06, 2019: [Passport Returned]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 25, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 23, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
  • October 13, 2018: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
  • October 13, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 04, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 03, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 03, 2018: [Dismiss ]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 25, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2018
  • April 28, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 09, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 16, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 06, 2015: [Sealed Document]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 17, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
February, 2015
  • February 17, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2014
  • November 13, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.