U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • May 17, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 12, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 12, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • March 08, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 16, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 10, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 26, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2014
  • November 18, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.