U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00138-47
  • Case Name: USA v. Moorning et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Returning Submission]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 09, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 05, 2020: [Seal]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 03, 2020: [Continue ]
  • September 03, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • August 18, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 18, 2020: [Violation Report]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 03, 2020: [Violation Report]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Continue ]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Continue ]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 17, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 17, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 06, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 27, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 27, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 25, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 09, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 08, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2018: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • September 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 04, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continue ]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2018: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • August 30, 2018: [Bond]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 27, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2018: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • July 02, 2018: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • July 02, 2018: [Bond]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 02, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 02, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 12, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2018: [Witness List]
  • April 23, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 20, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 20, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 18, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 18, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 18, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 17, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • April 05, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 02, 2018: [Violation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 14, 2017: [Violation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 26, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • March 21, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 10, 2017: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 31, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 29, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 22, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • November 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 04, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 19, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 12, 2016: [Violation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
  • September 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 09, 2016: [Violation Report]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 03, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 02, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 02, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 23, 2016: [Letter]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 08, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 03, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 03, 2016: [Violation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 25, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 24, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 16, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 14, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 08, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2014
  • December 12, 2014: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
November, 2014
  • November 20, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.