U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:93-cr-00240-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal - USSC Amendment]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - USSC Amendment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2014
  • November 24, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.