U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pressley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 23, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 10, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2014
  • November 25, 2014: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.