U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 09, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Transcript]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • July 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 22, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 21, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2015: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 08, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 08, 2015: [Dismiss ]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 26, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • June 26, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2014
  • November 28, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.