U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Garro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 03, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • June 04, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 28, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 18, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2020: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 01, 2020: [Conflict Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • April 15, 2020: [Conference]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 09, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2020: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Extension of Time]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [2255 Motion Filed]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • September 01, 2017: [Leave to File]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2017: [Reply to Response]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 24, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • July 17, 2017: [Response]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 02, 2017: [Hearing ]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 23, 2017: [Appear]
  • May 23, 2017: [Bond]
  • May 18, 2017: [Bond]
  • May 16, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Transcript]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Transcript]
  • May 06, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2016: [Dismiss ]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 14, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Transcript]
  • February 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Acquittal]
  • February 16, 2016: [New Trial]
  • February 04, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • February 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 22, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • December 17, 2015: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 17, 2015: [Court Exhibits]
  • December 17, 2015: [Witness List]
  • December 17, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • December 15, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • December 11, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 11, 2015: [Acquittal]
  • December 09, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 08, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 08, 2015: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • December 08, 2015: [Jury Selection]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 04, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 03, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 03, 2015: [Seal]
  • December 01, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • December 01, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 01, 2015: [Evidentiary Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 30, 2015: [Witness List]
  • November 30, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • November 20, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 19, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • November 19, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 03, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 02, 2015: [Dismiss ]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2015: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • August 11, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • August 11, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 10, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 10, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2015: [Indictment]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • August 03, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 22, 2015: [Status Conference]
December, 2014
  • December 04, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.