U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Continue ]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Continue ]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 05, 2019: [Violation Report]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 27, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 23, 2018: [Violation Report]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Violation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 18, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • December 14, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 06, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2014
  • December 08, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.