U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 27, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 26, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 05, 2021: [Violation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 23, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 01, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 21, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • October 23, 2020: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 18, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 14, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 09, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • May 03, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 03, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 14, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 06, 2017: [Violation Report]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 04, 2016: [Dismiss ]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • August 06, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2014
  • December 09, 2014: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.