U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00219-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parise
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 12, 2018: [Writ Issued]
  • December 11, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 11, 2018: [Seal]
  • December 11, 2018: [Application for Writ]
  • December 11, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2014
  • December 09, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.