U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Geddes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Travel]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Travel ]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Instrument Returned]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 03, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 26, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • February 26, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 13, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • November 07, 2018: [Passport Returned]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Return of Passport]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • July 12, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Return of Passport]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Extension of Time]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [2255 Motion Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • May 09, 2017: [Return of Passport]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Witness List]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 15, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Seal]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Passport Returned]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • February 15, 2017: [Exoneration of Bond]
  • February 15, 2017: [Return of Passport]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2017: [Dismiss ]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Bond]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 27, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • April 19, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • April 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 06, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • April 05, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2016: [Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 17, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • March 15, 2016: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • February 12, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • February 09, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 25, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • January 25, 2016: [Writ Returned]
  • January 22, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 15, 2016: [Writ Returned]
  • January 11, 2016: [Writ Returned]
  • January 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2015: [Writ Returned]
  • December 17, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 15, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2015: [Writ Issued]
  • December 11, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 11, 2015: [Seal]
  • December 11, 2015: [Application for Writ]
  • December 09, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 08, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • December 07, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 02, 2015: [Writ Returned]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 10, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 09, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 06, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 05, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 25, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 23, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 23, 2015: [Judgment]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 09, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 09, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 13, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 12, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2015: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 21, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • July 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 04, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • July 01, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 20, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 20, 2015: [Disclosure ]
  • June 18, 2015: [Disclosure ]
  • June 17, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
December, 2014
  • December 09, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.