U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Supersad
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • January 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 26, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 26, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 18, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Seal]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 12, 2016: [Continue ]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 01, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2014
  • December 15, 2014: [Waiver of Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.