U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 15, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 10, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 09, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 09, 2015: [Seal]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 19, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Order]
December, 2014
  • December 15, 2014: [Waiver of Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.