U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gadson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 15, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 15, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 03, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 03, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 01, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • January 30, 2017: [Seal]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 04, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 12, 2015: [Continue ]
December, 2014
  • December 16, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.