U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 19, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 14, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 13, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • June 12, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 12, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2014
  • December 16, 2014: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.