U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00202-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cuebas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [USM Return Unexecuted]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 10, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • February 10, 2021: [Vacate ]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • October 09, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2015: [Continue ]
May, 2015
  • May 19, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2014
  • December 18, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.