U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 16, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2014
  • December 22, 2014: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.