U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 23, 2021: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • June 23, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 22, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • October 11, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 10, 2019: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • June 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 01, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 16, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 20, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 09, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • April 04, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 21, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal - USSC Amendment]
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - USSC Amendment]
  • June 15, 2015: [Status Conference]
February, 2015
  • February 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2014
  • December 22, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.