U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • August 23, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 01, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 23, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - Sealed]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 13, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 06, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 03, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Sealed Document]
December, 2014
  • December 22, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.