U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00281-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 05, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 05, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • March 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 21, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 20, 2018: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • March 14, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 12, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 12, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 12, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 12, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2016: [Seal]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2014
  • December 22, 2014: [Order on Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.