U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00249-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garvin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Sealed Document]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 22, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice]
  • October 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 09, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 05, 2020: [Transcript]
  • October 02, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 08, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [2255 Motion Filed]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 21, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 14, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 13, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 13, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • June 11, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 04, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 25, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Continue ]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 13, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 09, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 03, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 17, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • June 01, 2016: [Substitute Attorney ]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 16, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Sealed Order]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 31, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • July 31, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 31, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 30, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 12, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2014
  • December 23, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.