U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00250-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Leave to File]
  • October 14, 2024: [Reply to Response]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [2255 Motion Filed]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Travel ]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 30, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • November 27, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2020: [Extension of Time]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 12, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • October 09, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2020: [Seal]
  • August 14, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • April 15, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 15, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • February 04, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • November 13, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Transcript]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order to Unseal Document]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 02, 2018: [Compel ]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2016: [Bond]
  • April 06, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • April 01, 2016: [Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 09, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 24, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 16, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Leave to File]
  • February 12, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 10, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 10, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • February 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 14, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 09, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 23, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 20, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 16, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2015: [New Trial]
  • October 13, 2015: [Acquittal]
  • October 13, 2015: [New Trial]
  • October 13, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2015: [Acquittal]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 07, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 29, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 29, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • September 25, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • September 24, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 24, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • September 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 23, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 20, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 18, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • September 18, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • September 16, 2015: [Preclude]
  • September 16, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • September 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 10, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • September 09, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • September 07, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 03, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 02, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • September 01, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • August 28, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • August 17, 2015: [Bond]
  • August 17, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 15, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order]
  • August 13, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 11, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 04, 2015: [Preclude]
  • August 04, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 03, 2015: [Reply to Response]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 24, 2015: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • July 23, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 22, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order]
  • July 21, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • July 21, 2015: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • July 20, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 23, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 19, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
December, 2014
  • December 23, 2014: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.