U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00186-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2014
  • December 24, 2014: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.