U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00058-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Luna et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 18, 2023: [Violation Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2023: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 04, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 04, 2023: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 19, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 19, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 12, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • May 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Departure]
  • May 11, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 02, 2020: [Continue ]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 26, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 24, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • March 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 12, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 24, 2020: [Seal]
  • February 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 04, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • January 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 05, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • December 05, 2019: [Hearing ]
  • December 05, 2019: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • September 12, 2019: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 27, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 22, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 22, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 16, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 13, 2019: [Seal]
  • August 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2019: [Continue ]
  • July 24, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • July 17, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 17, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • July 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 09, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • June 07, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 20, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 08, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 26, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel re Crack Cocaine]
  • August 24, 2016: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 30, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 30, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 30, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2015: [Writ Issued]
  • October 21, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 20, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • October 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
May, 2015
  • May 27, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 01, 2015: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
January, 2015
  • January 20, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 10, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2014
  • December 26, 2014: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.