U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Samas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 07, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 24, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Sealed Document]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2014
  • December 29, 2014: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.