U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00251-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dahl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 05, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 09, 2017: [Restitution Order]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 30, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 29, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
December, 2014
  • December 30, 2014: [Order for PSI and Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.