U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cox et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 18, 2023: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 16, 2021: [Seal]
  • February 16, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 10, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 10, 2021: [Seal]
  • February 10, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 16, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 16, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 01, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 01, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on ExParte Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [ExParte Motion]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 17, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 15, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 31, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 31, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • July 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2019: [Extension of Time]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 06, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Status Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 02, 2017: [Violation Report]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 20, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • January 10, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 10, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • December 08, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • December 08, 2015: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [USCA Request]
  • November 19, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Status Conference]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 24, 2015: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • July 22, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 22, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2014
  • December 31, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.