U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00272-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 30, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 30, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 06, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 31, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 08, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 13, 2016: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 11, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • October 15, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 06, 2015: [Extension of Time]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 18, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 07, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 26, 2015: [Seal]
  • August 26, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 25, 2015: [Seal]
  • August 25, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 21, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 12, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • August 11, 2015: [Extension of Time]
February, 2015
  • February 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2015
  • January 28, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2014
  • December 31, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.