U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:92-cr-00039-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • April 29, 2019: [Travel ]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • November 19, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • November 01, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 22, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 21, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 03, 2016: [Violation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 09, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 07, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 07, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 06, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 06, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 06, 2016: [Add Counts]
  • June 06, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
  • May 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 10, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2015
  • April 30, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
January, 2015
  • January 05, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.