U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carter et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 27, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • October 27, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 28, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 27, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 21, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 21, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 17, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 16, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 15, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 14, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 19, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 11, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order]
January, 2015
  • January 07, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.