U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 12, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Letter]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 06, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
January, 2015
  • January 10, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.