U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brunache
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 23, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 19, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • April 02, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 29, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Competency Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 30, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 30, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Psychiatric Exam]
January, 2015
  • January 12, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.