U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ashline
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 19, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 08, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • October 08, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Compliance Review Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • May 22, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 22, 2020: [Violation Report]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 06, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2019: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Violation Report]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • November 25, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 29, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 24, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 24, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [USM Return Unexecuted]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 04, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 30, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • November 28, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 28, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 28, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 28, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 19, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2018: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 15, 2018: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 14, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 13, 2018: [Arrest ]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 03, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 19, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 12, 2018: [Violation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 11, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 11, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 13, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Bond]
  • March 31, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 09, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 09, 2015: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 07, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2015: [Continue ]
January, 2015
  • January 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.