U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00131-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Potolicchio et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 16, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • December 28, 2016: [Return of Passport]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 03, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 03, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 03, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 01, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 01, 2015: [Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 18, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 17, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 17, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 02, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 02, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2015
  • January 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.